SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-7988 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-7988 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Robert Allen Poyson, Petitioner
v.
Arizona
Docketed:
May 11, 2021
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Arizona
Case Numbers:
(CR-98-0510-AP)
Decision Date:
November 2, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
December 7, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
May 06 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 10, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
May 26 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 10, 2021 to July 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 27 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 12, 2021.
Jun 21 2021
Motion to File Revised Appendix of Robert Poyson not accepted for filing. (September 23, 2021)
Jul 12 2021
Brief of respondent State of Arizona in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 26 2021
Reply of petitioner Robert Poyson filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Natman Schaye
Counsel of Record
Arizona Capital Representation Project
25 S Grande Ave
Tucson, AZ 85745
natman@azcapitalproject.org
5209070457
Party name: Robert Poyson
Attorneys for Respondent
Ginger Jarvis
Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General's Office
2005 North Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004
ginger.jarvis@azag.gov
(602) 542-4686
Party name: State of Arizona
David Robert Cole
Office of the Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004
CLDocket@azag.gov
602-542-4686
Party name: State of Arizona
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##