SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-7865 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-7865 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Terry Lee Froman, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:
April 27, 2021
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Ohio
Case Numbers:
(2017-0938)
Decision Date:
September 24, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
November 24, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 22 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 27, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
May 25 2021
Brief of respondent State of Ohio in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 09 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 28 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jessica Leigh Houston
Counsel of Record
The Office of the Ohio Public Defender
250 E. Broad St., Ste. 1400
Columbus, OH 43215
jessica.houston@opd.ohio.gov
614-466-5394
Party name: Terry Froman
Attorneys for Respondent
David P. Fornshell
Counsel of Record
Warren County Prosecutor's Office
520 Justice Drive
Lebanon, OH 45036
david.fornshell@warrencountyprosecutor.com
513-695-1325
Party name: State of Ohio
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##