SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-7683 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-7683 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Paul Wesley Baker, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:
April 7, 2021
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of California
Case Numbers:
(S170280)
Decision Date:
February 1, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 31 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 7, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Appendix
Appendix
Proof of Service
Apr 23 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 7, 2021 to June 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 26 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 7, 2021.
Jun 03 2021
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jun 17 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Frederick Schuck
Counsel of Record
Law Office of John F. Schuck
885 N. San Antonio Road
Suite A
Los Altos, CA 94022
schuckappeal@hotmail.com
16503835325
Party name: Paul Baker
Attorneys for Respondent
Ernesto Carlos Dominguez
Counsel of Record
California Attorney General's Office
300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702
Los Angeles, CA 90013
carlos.dominguez@doj.ca.gov
213-269-6120
Party name: California
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##