Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-768
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-768
Title:Gerardo Serrano, Petitioner
v.
United States Customs and Border Protection, et al.
Docketed:December 4, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-50977)
   Decision Date:September 16, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 01 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 4, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Gerardo Serrano
Blanket Consent
Dec 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 4, 2021 to February 3, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 3, 2021
Jan 04 2021Brief amici curiae of David B. Smith, LEAP, and the R Street Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2021 to March 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 5, 2021.
Mar 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 5, 2021 to March 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 16, 2021.
Mar 16 2021Brief of respondents U.S. Customs and Border Protection, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 30 2021Reply of petitioner Gerardo Serrano filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 19 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Everett Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
16781 Chagrin Blvd. #256
Shaker Heights, OH 44120

rjohnson@ij.org
703.682.9320
Party name: Gerardo Serrano
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: U.S. Customs and Border Protection, et al.
Other
Thomas G. Hungar
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

thungar@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: David B. Smith, LEAP, and the R Street Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543