Docket for 20-7238 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Feb 08 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 26, 2021) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | Mar 16 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2021 to April 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 17 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 26, 2021. | | | Apr 23 2021 | Brief of respondent State of Mississippi in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 12 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021. | | | Jun 01 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|