Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-7001
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-7001
Title:Aaron J. Bressi, Petitioner
v.
Jeffrey Brennen, et al.
Docketed:January 29, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3199)
   Decision Date:August 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 9, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 1, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix
Mar 01 2021Waiver of right of respondents Edward Purcell; Christopher Lapotskie; Cahd Yoder; Christopher Williams; Chief William Carpenter; Terry Kechem; Patrolman Adams; Jeffrey Brennen to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Aaron J. BressiMC #9898
P.O. Box A
Rockview
Bellefonte, PA 16823

Party name: Aaron J. Bressi
Attorneys for Respondents
Kimberly A. Boyer-Cohen
    Counsel of Record
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin
2000 Market St., Suite 23rd Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

kaboyer@mdwcg.com
(215)-575-2707
Party name: Edward Purcell; Christopher Lapotskie; Cahd Yoder; Christopher Williams; Chief William Carpenter; Terry Kechem; Patrolman Adams; Jeffrey Brennen

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543