Docket for 20-6929 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 19 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 24, 2021) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix | Feb 24 2021 | Brief of respondent Tony Mays, Warden Riverbend Maximum Security Institution in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 08 2021 | Reply of petitioner Stephen Hugueley filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Mar 11 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021. | | | Mar 29 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | | May 27 2021 | Motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing filed by petitioner Stephen Hugueley. | | Main DocumentOther | Jun 08 2021 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021. | | | Jun 28 2021 | Motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing filed by petitioner DENIED. | | |
|