Docket for 20-6914 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 19 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 25, 2021) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServicePetitionAppendix | Jan 27 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 25, 2021 to March 27, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 28 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 29, 2021. See Rule 30.1. | | | Mar 29 2021 | Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 15 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021. | | | May 03 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|