Docket for 20-6891 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 07 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 16, 2021) | | PetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis | Feb 15 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2021 to February 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 16 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2021. | | | Feb 26 2021 | Brief of respondents Florida Department of Corrections in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 17 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021. | | | Apr 05 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|