Docket for 20-6876 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 08 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 16, 2021) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceProof of Service | Feb 02 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2021 to March 2, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 03 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 2, 2021. | | | Mar 01 2021 | Brief of respondent Benjamin Ford in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 08 2021 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from March 17, 2021 to April 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 09 2021 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until April 8, 2021 granted. | | | Apr 07 2021 | Reply of petitioner Leon Tollette filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 08 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021. | | | Apr 26 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|