Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-6864
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-6864
Title:Brian David Hill, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-4758)
   Decision Date:October 16, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 17, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 12, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 22 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 28 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Edward Ryan Kennedy
    Counsel of Record
Robinson & McElwee, PLLC
140 W. Main Street
Suite 300
Clarksburg, WV 26301

erk@ramlaw.com
304-326-5318
Party name: Brian Hill
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543