Docket for 20-6822 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 31 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 10, 2021) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixProof of Service | Feb 02 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 10, 2021 to March 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 03 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 12, 2021. | | | Mar 05 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 12, 2021 to April 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 08 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 12, 2021. | | | Apr 09 2021 | Brief of respondent Ron Davis, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Apr 27 2021 | Reply of petitioner Berryman filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 28 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021. | | | May 17 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|