Docket for 20-6799 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 31 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 8, 2021) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix | Jan 29 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2021 to March 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 01 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 10, 2021. | | | Mar 10 2021 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 17 2021 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from March 25, 2021 to April 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 18 2021 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until April 8, 2021 granted. | | | Apr 06 2021 | Reply of petitioner Kosoul Chanthakoummane filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 08 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021. | | | Apr 26 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|