SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-6769 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-6769 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Juan David Rodriguez, Petitioner
v.
Mark S. Inch, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Docketed:
January 5, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(16-11258)
Decision Date:
June 22, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
July 27, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 23 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 4, 2021)
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Feb 04 2021
Brief of respondent Florida, Department of Corrections in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 18 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 08 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott Michael Gavin
Counsel of Record
Captial Collateral Regional Counsel-South
110 S.E. 6th Street, Suite 701
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
gavins@ccsr.state.fl.us
9547131284
Party name: Juan David Rodriguez
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: Florida, Department of Corrections
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##