Dec 08 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 7, 2021) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service |
Dec 08 2020 | Application (20A110) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Alito. |
| Main Document |
Dec 09 2020 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
Dec 10 2020 | Reply of petitioner Brandon Bernard filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Dec 10 2020 | Supplemental brief in support of stay application filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Dec 10 2020 | Second Supp. to Stay of Execution of Brandon Bernard not accepted for filing. (December 10, 2020 -- corrected version docketed above) |
| |
Dec 10 2020 | Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer and Justice Kagan would grant the petition for a writ of certiorari. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari and application for stay. (Detached Opinion) |
| |
Dec 10 2020 | Application (20A110) referred to the Court. |
| |
Dec 10 2020 | Application (20A110) denied by the Court. Justice Breyer and Justice Kagan would grant the application. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari and application for stay. (Detached opinion) |
| |