SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-6518 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-6518 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Blaine Milam, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:
December 3, 2020
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
Case Numbers:
(WR-79, 322-02)
Decision Date:
July 1, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 27 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 4, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Dec 21 2020
Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Other
Jan 05 2021
Reply of petitioner Blaine Milam filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jan 28 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jennae Rose Swiergula
Counsel of Record
Texas Defender Service
1023 Springdale Road #14E
Austin, TX 78721
jswiergula@texasdefender.org
(512) 320-8300
Party name: Blaine Milam
Attorneys for Respondent
Tomee Morgan Heining
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station
Austin, TX 78711
tomee.heining@oag.texas.gov
5124632148
Party name: Texas
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##