SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-6500 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-6500 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Alfred Bourgeois, Petitioner
v.
T. J. Watson, Warden, et al.
Docketed:
December 3, 2020
Linked with 20A104
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(20-1891)
Decision Date:
October 6, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
December 1, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 02 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 4, 2021)
Petition
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Other
Appendix
Appendix
Proof of Service
Dec 03 2020
Brief amicus curiae of The Constitution Project filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 03 2020
Application (20A104) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main Document
Dec 04 2020
Brief of respondents T. J. Watson, Warden, et al. in opposition filed.
Proof of Service
Main Document
Dec 07 2020
Reply of petitioner Alfred Bourgeois filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Dec 11 2020
Application (20A104) referred to the Court.
Dec 11 2020
Petition DENIED.
Dec 11 2020
Application (20A104) denied by the Court. JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR, with whom JUSTICE KAGAN joins, dissenting from the denial of certiorari and application for stay. (Detached
opinion
)
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Victor J. Abreu Jr.
Counsel of Record
Federal Court Divisions, Defender Association of P
Curtis Center, Suite 545 West
Independence Square West
Philadelphia, PA 19106
victor_abreu@fd.org
215-928-0520
Party name: Alfred Bourgeois
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey B. Wall
Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: T. J. Watson, Warden, et al.
Other
Meir Feder
Counsel of Record
Jones Day
250 Vesey Street
New York, NY 10281
mfeder@jonesday.com
(212) 326-3939
Party name: The Constitution Project
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##