Docket for 20-6498 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 27 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 4, 2021) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Dec 18 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 4, 2021 to February 3, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 21 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 3, 2021. | | | Jan 27 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2021 to March 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 28 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 5, 2021. | | | Mar 05 2021 | Brief of respondent Jefferson Dunn in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 19 2021 | Reply of petitioner Tony Barksdale filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 25 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021. | | | Apr 19 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|