Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-6444 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-6444 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Ronnie Eugene Fuston, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:November 27, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(D-2017-773)
   Decision Date:March 5, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 12, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 28, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixProof of ServiceProof of Service
Dec 28 2020Brief of respondent Oklahoma in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrea Digilio Miller
    Counsel of Record
800 N Harvey Ave.
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

admiller@okcu.edu
405-208-6161
Party name: Ronnie Eugene Fuston
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer L. Crabb
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
313 N.E. 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: Oklahoma

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543