Docket for 20-6307 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 09 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 14, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Dec 08 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2020 to February 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 09 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 12, 2021. | | | Feb 09 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 12, 2021 to February 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 10 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 26, 2021. | | | Feb 26 2021 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 08 2021 | Reply of petitioner Gary Lawrence filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 11 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021. | | | Mar 17 2021 | Rescheduled. | | | May 05 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021. | | | May 24 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|