Docket for 20-6294 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 06 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 14, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Dec 02 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2020 to February 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 03 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 12, 2021. | | | Feb 12 2021 | Brief of respondents Benjamin Ford, Warden, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 24 2021 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from March 4, 2021 to March 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 02 2021 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until March 17, 2021 granted. | | | Mar 16 2021 | Reply of petitioner Richard Sealey filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 17 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021. | | | Apr 05 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|