Docket for 20-6218 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Oct 30 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 7, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Nov 23 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 7, 2020 to January 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 24 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 6, 2021. | | | Dec 30 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 6, 2021 to January 20, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 31 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 20, 2021. | | | Jan 19 2021 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther | Feb 04 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021. | | | Feb 22 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|