Docket for 20-6210 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Oct 27 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 4, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixProof of Service | Nov 12 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2020 to January 4, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 13 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 4, 2021. | | | Dec 16 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 4, 2021 to February 3, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 17 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 3, 2021. | | | Jan 28 2021 | Brief of respondent Ronald Davis, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 08 2021 | Reply of petitioner Deondre Staten filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 11 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021. | | | Mar 01 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|