SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-6166 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-6166 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Brad Keith Sigmon, Petitioner
v.
Bryan Stirling, Commissioner, South Carolina Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:
October 29, 2020
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-7)
Decision Date:
April 15, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
May 27, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 26 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 30, 2020)
Petition
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Nov 30 2020
Brief of respondent Bryan Stirling in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Dec 14 2020
Reply of petitioner Brad Sigmon submitted.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Dec 17 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joshua Snow Kendrick
Counsel of Record
Kendrick & Leonard, P.C.
P.O. Box 6938
Greenville, SC 29606
josh@kendrickleonard.com
8647604000
Party name: Brad Sigmon
Attorneys for Respondents
Melody Jane Brown
Counsel of Record
South Carolina Attorney General's Office
Post Office Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211
mbrown@scag.gov
803-734-3742
Party name: Bryan Stirling
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##