Docket for 20-609
|
Oct 30 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 7, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 23 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021. | | | Jan 04 2021 | Response Requested. (Due February 3, 2021) | | | Jan 11 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2021 to March 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 11 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 5, 2021. | | | Mar 05 2021 | Brief of respondent Jeffrey Quatrone in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 23 2021 | Reply of petitioners Gannett Co., Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 24 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021. | | | Apr 19 2021 | The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. | | | Nov 09 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 22 2021 | Supplemental brief of petitioners Gannett Co., Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 23 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021. | | | Dec 13 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|