SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-6060 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-6060 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Benjamin Davis Smiley, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
October 19, 2020
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC18-385)
Decision Date:
May 14, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 18, 2020)
Petition
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Nov 18 2020
Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Dec 03 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Anthony Norgard
Counsel of Record
Norgard, Norgard & Chastang
310 E. Main Street
Bartow, FL 33830
norgardlaw@verizon.net
8635338556
Party name: Benjamin Smiley
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##