SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-5954 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-5954 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Meryl S. McDonald, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
October 8, 2020
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC19-635)
Decision Date:
June 4, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 9, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Nov 09 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 9, 2020 to November 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 10 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 23, 2020.
Nov 18 2020
Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Dec 03 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 10 2020
Reply of petitioner Meryl McDonald filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jan 11 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Meryl S. McDonald
180399
PO Box 1000
Raiford, FL 32083-1000
Party name: Meryl McDonald
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##