SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-5802 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-5802 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Timothy W. Saunders, Petitioner
v.
Terry Raybon, Warden
Docketed:
September 25, 2020
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(19-10817)
Decision Date:
February 21, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
April 22, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 21 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 26, 2020)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Oct 15 2020
Brief of respondent Terry Raybon, Warden in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Oct 29 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/13/2020.
Oct 29 2020
Reply of petitioner Timothy Saunders filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Nov 16 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allyson Renee duLac
Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Middle District of Alabama
817 S. Court Street
Montgomery, AL 36104
Allyson_duLac@fd.org
3348342099
Party name: Timothy Saunders
Attorneys for Respondent
Lauren Ashley Simpson
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General State of Alabama
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130
lauren.simpson@alabamaag.gov
3343531209
Party name: Terry Raybon, Warden
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##