Sep 09 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 23, 2020) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service |
Oct 15 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 23, 2020 to November 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Oct 15 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 23, 2020. |
| |
Oct 21 2020 | Request from petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari received by the Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Nov 13 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 23, 2020 to December 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Nov 16 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 23, 2020. |
| |
Dec 23 2020 | Brief of respondent Robert Wong in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Dec 30 2020 | Petitioner's request to delay distribution of the petition granted. The petition will be distributed on January 21, 2021. |
| |
Dec 31 2020 | Reply of petitioner Rodney Berryman, Sr. filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Jan 21 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021. |
| |
Feb 22 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
| |
Mar 08 2021 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
| Main DocumentOtherProof of Service |
Apr 07 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021. |
| |
Apr 26 2021 | Rehearing DENIED. |
| |