SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-5760 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-5760 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Daniel Carl Frederickson, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:
September 21, 2020
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of California
Case Numbers:
(S067392)
Decision Date:
February 3, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
April 22, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 15 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 21, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Proof of Service
Oct 13 2020
Brief of respondent The State of California in opposition filed.
Main Document
Main Document
Oct 26 2020
Reply of petitioner Daniel Carl Frederickson filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Certificate of Word Count
Oct 29 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/13/2020.
Nov 16 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Douglas Gwynne Ward
Counsel of Record
350 Bay Street, P.M.B #199
San Francisco, CA 94133
wardhere@icloud.com
4156941082
Party name: Daniel Carl Frederickson
Attorneys for Respondent
Ronald Alan Jakob
Counsel of Record
CA Dept. of Justice
600 West Broadway
Suite 1800
San Diego, CA 92101
ronald.jakob@doj.ca.gov
16197389149
Party name: The State of California
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##