Docket for 20-5748 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 04 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 19, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 08 2020 | Motion of Louisiana for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (October 09, 2020) | | | Oct 08 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 19, 2020 to December 18, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 09 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 18, 2020. | | | Dec 18 2020 | Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 04 2021 | Reply of petitioner Dacarius Holliday submitted. | | Main Document | Jan 07 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021. | | | Jan 25 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|