Sep 04 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 13, 2020) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther |
Oct 07 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 13, 2020 to November 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Oct 07 2020 | Consent of filing of amicus curiae brief of David Blaszczak not accepted for filing. (October 09, 2020) (Document not of the type that is to be filed electronically). |
| |
Oct 08 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 12, 2020. |
| |
Oct 09 2020 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, David Blaszczak |
| Blanket Consent |
Oct 09 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. VIDED. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Oct 09 2020 | Brief of respondent Christopher Worrall in support submitted. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Oct 14 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2020 to November 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Oct 15 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 24, 2020. |
| |
Nov 24 2020 | Memorandum for the United States filed. VIDED. |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
Dec 08 2020 | Reply of petitioner David Blaszczak submitted. |
| Main Document |
Dec 09 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021. |
| |
Jan 11 2021 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Kelly v. United States, 590 U. S. ___ (2020). |
| |
Feb 12 2021 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
| |