Docket for 20-5563 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 27 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 2, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix | Sep 25 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 2, 2020 to November 2, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 28 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 2, 2020. | | | Oct 20 2020 | Brief of respondent Shoop, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 03 2020 | Reply of petitioner Richard Bays filed. Distributed | | Main Document | Nov 05 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020. | | | Nov 23 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|