Docket for 20-5562 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 28 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 5, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | Oct 01 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 5, 2020 to November 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 02 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 4, 2020. | | | Nov 04 2020 | Brief of respondent State of Nebraska in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | Nov 18 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020. | | | Dec 07 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|