Docket for 20-5517 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 18 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 28, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Sep 09 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 28, 2020 to November 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 11 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 12, 2020. | | | Nov 05 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2020 to November 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 06 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 27, 2020. | | | Nov 25 2020 | Brief of respondent State of Arkansas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 10 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021. | | | Jan 11 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|