SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-5492 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-5492 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Ray Lamar Johnston, Petitioner
v.
Mark S. Inch, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:
August 25, 2020
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(14-14054)
Decision Date:
February 3, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
March 24, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 20 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 24, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Proof of Service
Appendix
Sep 24 2020
Brief of respondents State of Florida, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Other
Oct 08 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.
Oct 08 2020
Reply of petitioner Ray Lamar Johnston filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Nov 02 2020
Petition DENIED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Dixon Hendry
Counsel of Record
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel- Middle Region "CCRC-M"
12973 N. Telecom Parkway
Temple Terrace, FL 33637
hendry@ccmr.state.fl.us
8135581600
Party name: Ray Lamar Johnston
Attorneys for Respondents
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##