SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-5378 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-5378 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
James Lynn Styers, Petitioner
v.
David Shinn, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections
Docketed:
August 17, 2020
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(17-17356)
Decision Date:
March 11, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
March 11, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 10 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 16, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Appendix
Sep 16 2020
Brief of respondent David Shinn in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Other
Sep 16 2020
Exhibits to Brief in Opposition of David Shinn not accepted for filing. (September 23, 2020)
Oct 01 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 13 2020
Reply of petitioner James Styers submitted.
Main Document
Oct 19 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Julie Singleton Hall
Counsel of Record
779 South Cody Loop Road
Oracle, AZ 85623
JulieSHall@hotmail.com
5208962890
Party name: James Styers
Attorneys for Respondent
Ginger Jarvis
Counsel of Record
Attorney General's Office
2005 N. Central Ave.,
Phoenix, AZ 85004
ginger.jarvis@azag.gov
(602) 542-8557
Party name: David Shinn
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##