Docket for 20-5342 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 07 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 14, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Sep 08 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 14, 2020 to October 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 09 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 14, 2020. | | | Sep 14 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Steven C. Gabaeff, et al. submitted. | | Main DocumentOtherOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 14 2020 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 20 2020 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from October 29, 2020 to December 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 21 2020 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until December 3, 2020 granted. | | | Dec 01 2020 | Reply of petitioner Rigoberto Avila, Jr. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 03 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021. | | | Jan 11 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|