SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-5119 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-5119 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Wayne Powell, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:
July 21, 2020
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Ohio, Lucas County
Case Numbers:
(L-18-1194, L-18-1195)
Decision Date:
October 18, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
February 18, 2020
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 16 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 20, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Aug 20 2020
Brief of respondent Ohio in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 17 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Erika Marie LaHote
Counsel of Record
Office of the Ohio Public Defender
250 East Broad Street, Suite 1400
Columbus, OH 43215
erika.lahote@opd.ohio.gov
6144663373
Party name: Wayne Powell
Attorneys for Respondent
Evy Michale Jarrett
Counsel of Record
Lucas County Prosecutor's Office
700 Adams Street, 2nd Floor
Toledo, OH 43604
ejarrett@co.lucas.oh.us
4192132063
Party name: Ohio
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##