Docket for 20-5089 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 13 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 17, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jul 27 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 17, 2020 to September 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 28 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 16, 2020. | | | Sep 10 2020 | Brief of respondent Kevin Chappell in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 21 2020 | Reply of petitioner William Kirkpatrick, Jr. filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Sep 24 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020. | | | Oct 13 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|