Jul 10 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 17, 2020) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixProof of Service |
Aug 05 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 17, 2020 to September 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Aug 06 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 16, 2020. |
| |
Aug 17 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of California Attorneys for Criminal Justice filed. |
| Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document |
Sep 04 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 16, 2020 to October 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Sep 08 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 16, 2020. |
| |
Oct 16 2020 | Brief of respondent State of California in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Oct 28 2020 | Reply of petitioner Joe Edward Johnson filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Nov 05 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020. |
| |
Nov 17 2020 | Record Requested. |
| |
Dec 01 2020 | Record received from the Supreme Court of California (8 boxes). |
| |
Dec 10 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021. |
| |
Dec 16 2020 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Jan 11 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021. |
| |
Jan 11 2021 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Jan 19 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021. |
| |
Jan 19 2021 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Feb 12 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021. |
| |
Feb 22 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
| |
Feb 26 2021 | Record returned to the Supreme Court of California (8 boxes). |
| |