Jul 15 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 19, 2020) |
| PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jul 31 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 19, 2020 to September 18, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Aug 04 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 18, 2020. |
| |
Sep 09 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 18, 2020 to October 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Sep 11 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 19, 2020. |
| |
Oct 16 2020 | Brief of respondent Arkansas in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentMain Document |
Oct 30 2020 | Reply of petitioner Stacey Eugene Johnson filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Nov 04 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020. |
| |
Nov 17 2020 | Record Requested. |
| |
Dec 01 2020 | Record received from the Supreme Court of Arkansas. The record is electronic. |
| |
Dec 09 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021. |
| |
Dec 09 2020 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Jan 11 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021. |
| |
Jan 11 2021 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Jan 19 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021. |
| |
Jan 19 2021 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Feb 12 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021. |
| |
Feb 22 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
| |