Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-443
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-443
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Dzhokhar A. Tsarnaev
Docketed:October 6, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-6001)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 06 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 5, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Oct 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 5, 2020 to December 7, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 7, 2020.
Nov 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of The National Fraternal Order of Police filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2020United States opposition to respondent's 30-day extension request not accepted for filing. (November 23, 2020 - corrected letter to be submitted)
Nov 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 7, 2020 to January 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 23 2020Response to motion for an extension of time from petitioner United States filed.
Main Document
Nov 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; the time is extended to and including December 17, 2020.
Dec 17 2020Brief of respondent Dzhokhar A. Tsarnaev in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 18 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5. filed.
Main Document
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 23 2020Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021Petition GRANTED.
Mar 26 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Apr 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 14, 2021. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 20, 2021.
Apr 22 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Dzhokhar A. Tsarnaev
Blanket Consent
Apr 28 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, United States
Blanket Consent
May 05 2021Brief amici curiae of James Fetzer, Ph. D., et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 14 2021Joint appendix Volume I and II filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Jun 14 2021Brief of petitioner United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 14 2021Motion for leave to file Volume III of the joint appendix under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by petitioner United States.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 14 2021Joint appendix Volume III (Redacted) filed. (Docketed 8/2/21).
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of The National Fraternal Order of Police filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, October 13, 2021.
Jul 28 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit.
Aug 02 2021Motion for leave to file Volume III of the joint appendix under seal with redacted copies for the public record GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Ginger D. Anders
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

ginger.anders@mto.com
2022201107
Party name: Dzhokhar A. Tsarnaev
Other
John Remington Graham
    Counsel of Record
180 Haut de la Paroisse
St-Agapit, XX G0S 1Z0

jack.graham@globetrotter.net
418-888-5049
Party name: James Fetzer, Ph. D., et al.
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464000
Party name: The National Fraternal Order of Police
Kent S. Scheidegger
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Fdtn.
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

briefs@cjlf.org
9164460345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543