Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-429
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-429
Vide 20-454, 20-539
Title:American Medical Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.
Docketed:October 5, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35386, 19-35394, 19-15979)
   Decision Date:February 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 8, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 4, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 4, 2020 to December 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 4, 2020.
Nov 04 2020Letter of October 26, 2020 from counsel for respondents Oregon, et al. received.
Main Document
Nov 04 2020Brief of respondents States of Oregon, New York, California, et al. in support filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 04 2020Brief for the Federal Respondents filed. VIDED
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 22 2020Reply of petitioners American Medical Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Petition GRANTED. The petitions for writs of certiorari in Nos. 20-454 and 20-539 are granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Feb 22 2021Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-429. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-429. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Mar 08 2021Motion for leave to intervene filed by State of Ohio and 18 Other States. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Mar 12 2021Joint stipulation to dismiss the cases in Nos. 20-429 and 20-539 pursuant to Rule 46.1 filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 12 2021Joint stipulation to dismiss the case in No. 20-454 pursuant to Rule 46.1 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 12 2021Motion for leave to intervene filed by American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, et al. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Mar 15 2021Motion for leave to file a supplemental brief in support of intervention filed by State of Ohio and 18 Other States. VIDED. (To be printed)
Mar 15 2021Motion for leave to file a supplemental brief in support of intervention filed by State of Ohio and 18 Other States. VIDED. (March 18, 2021).
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Mar 15 2021Motion for leave to file a supplemental brief in support of intervention filed by American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, et al. VIDED. (To be printed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 18 2021Response of the Federal Parties in opposition to the motions for leave to intervene filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 18 2021Response of American Medical Association, et al. in opposition to motions for leave to intervene filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Mar 18 2021Response of States of Oregon, New York, California, et al. in opposition to motions for leave to intervene filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentOther
Mar 19 2021Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Support of Intervention filed by American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, Christian Medical and Dental Associations, Catholic Medical Association. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Mar 19 2021Reply of State of Ohio and 18 Other States in support of motion to intervene filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 22 2021Reply of American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, et al. in support of motion to intervene filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Apr 01 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' briefs on the merits filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Apr 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' briefs on the merits is granted, and the time is extended to and including May 6, 2021. VIDED.
Apr 15 2021Letter of April 15, 2021 from the Acting Solicitor General filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Apr 26 2021The Acting Solicitor General is directed to file a letter brief addressing the following question: Whether the Government intends to continue to enforce the challenged rule and regulations outside the State of Maryland until the completion of notice and comment; and, if further litigation is brought against the challenged rule and regulations outside of Maryland, how the Government would intend to respond. The brief, not to exceed three pages, is to be filed by Monday, May 3, 2021. The non-federal parties and the proposed intervenors may submit any responses in letter briefs, not to exceed three pages each, by Monday, May 10, 2021. VIDED.
Apr 29 2021Motion for a further extension of time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' briefs on the merits filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Apr 29 2021Motion for a further extension of time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' briefs on the merits granted, and the time is extended to and including June 3, 2021. VIDED.
May 03 2021Letter brief of the Acting Solicitor General filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main Document
May 10 2021Letter brief in response of proposed intervenors State of Ohio and 18 Other States filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 10 2021Letter brief in response of proposed intervenors American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed).
Main Document
May 17 2021The Government has filed a letter brief representing that it will continue enforcing the challenged rule and regulations outside the State of Maryland for as long as they remain operative. If further litigation is brought against the challenged rule and regulations outside of Maryland, the Government represents that it will either oppose that litigation on threshold grounds or seek to hold the litigation in abeyance pending the completion of notice and comment. In light of the Government’s representations, the motions for leave to intervene are denied, and the petitions in Nos. 20-429, 20-454, and 20-539 are dismissed pursuant to Rule 46.1. If the Government fails to enforce the challenged rule and regulations outside of Maryland prior to the completion of notice and comment, or if litigation is brought against the challenged rule and regulations outside of Maryland, any aggrieved party may file an application in this Court after seeking relief in the appropriate District Court and Court of Appeals. Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, and Justice Gorsuch would grant the motions for leave to intervene and deny the stipulations to dismiss the petitions. VIDED.
May 17 2021Motion for leave to intervene filed by State of Ohio and 18 Other States DENIED. VIDED.
May 17 2021Motion for leave to intervene filed by American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, et al. DENIED. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul Reinherz Quitman Wolfson
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr, LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
2026636390
Party name: American Medical Association, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

andrew.tutt@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: States of Oregon, New York, California, et al.
Other
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, et al.
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: State of Ohio and 18 Other States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543