Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-424
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-424
Title:IYM Technologies LLC, Petitioner
v.
RPX Corporation, et al.
Docketed:October 2, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1761)
   Decision Date:March 9, 2020
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:May 8, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2020Waiver of right of respondent RPX Corporation, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/13/2020.
Nov 16 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrea Pacelli
    Counsel of Record
King & Wood Mallesons LLP
500 Fifth Avenue, 50th Floor
New York, NY 10110

andrea.pacelli@us.kwm.com
212-319-4755
Party name: IYM Technologies LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard F. Giunta
    Counsel of Record
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, P.C.
600 Atlantic Avenue
Boston, MA 02210

rgiunta@wolfgreenfield.com
617-646-8000
Party name: RPX Corporation, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543