Docket for 20-361
|
Sep 14 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 19, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 23 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent David Danner, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Sep 30 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020. | | | Oct 02 2020 | Response Requested. (Due November 2, 2020) | | | Oct 12 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 2, 2020 to December 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 13 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 4, 2020. | | | Nov 02 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 02 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Richard Aynes, James Ely, Richard Epstein, Christopher Green, Michael Lawrence, and Rebecca Zietlow filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 02 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Professors Michael A. Schoeppner, Melvin Patrick Ely, and W. Jeffrey Bolster filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 04 2020 | Brief of respondents Washington Utilities and Transportation Commission in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 18 2020 | Reply of petitioners James Courtney, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 23 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021. | | | Jan 11 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|