Docket for 20-250 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 28 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 23 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2020 to November 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 24 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 30, 2020. | | | Nov 23 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 30, 2020 to December 7, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 24 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 7, 2020. | | | Dec 07 2020 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 22 2020 | Reply of petitioner Mark Anthony Poole filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 23 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021. | | | Jan 11 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|