Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-222
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-222
Title:Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, et al.
Docketed:August 25, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3667)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 15, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 24, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2020 to October 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 08 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 23, 2020.
Sep 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2020Brief amici curiae of Former SEC Officials and Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Society for Corporate Governance filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2020Brief amici curiae of Securities and Financial Markets Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2020Brief amici curiae of Financial Economists filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 21 2020Brief of respondents Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from November 4, 2020 to November 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 26 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until November 17, 2020 granted.
Nov 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Nov 17 2020Reply of petitioners Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Dec 11 2020Petition GRANTED.
Jan 14 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 14 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 25 2021Brief of petitioners Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2021Joint appendix (2 volumes & 1 supplemental) filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Feb 01 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 29, 2021.
Feb 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 01 2021Brief amici curiae of American International Group, Inc. et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Financial Economists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Feb 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Securities and Financial Markets Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Former SEC Officials and Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Society for Corporate Governance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Feb 11 2021Record from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit, along with SEALED material been electronically filed.
Feb 11 2021Record from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York is electronic and located on Pacer, with the exception of 1 Box of Sealed records.
Feb 22 2021CIRCULATED.
Feb 24 2021Brief of respondents Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of Better Markets, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Brief amici curiae of Former SEC Officials filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of The North American Securities Administrators Association, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Brief amici curiae of Financial Economists filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Brief amici curiae of Evidence Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Brief amici curiae of Institutional Investors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors of Securities Law and Complex Litigation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Brief amici curiae of State of New Mexico et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Brief amici curiae of Public Citizen and Public Citizen Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Shareholder and Consumer Attorneys filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Mar 19 2021Reply of petitioners Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2021Argued. For petitioners: Kannon K. Shanmugam, Washington, D. C. For United States, as amicus curiae: Sopan Joshi, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Thomas C. Goldstein, Bethesda, Md.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tgoldstein@goldsteinrussell.com
2023620636
Party name: Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Rachel Sarah Bloomekatz
    Counsel of Record
Bloomekatz Law LLC
1148 Neil Avenue
Columbus, OH 43201

rachel@bloomekatzlaw.com
614-259-7611
Party name: Evidence Law Professors
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Institutional Investors
Todd G. Cosenza
    Counsel of Record
Willkie, Farr & Gallagher, LLP
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019

tcosenza@willkie.com
212-728-8677
Party name: Former SEC Officials and Law Professors
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Alexander Dubose & Jefferson LLP
Walnut Glen Tower
8144 Walnut Hill Lane, Ste. 1000
Dallas, TX 75231

dgeyser@adjtlaw.com
214-396-0441
Party name: Financial Economists (Bottomside)
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Professors of Securities Law and Complex Litigation
Susan E. Hurd
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird LLP
1201 West Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA 30309

susan.hurd@alston.com
404-881-7572
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Michael Courtney Keats
    Counsel of Record
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
One New York Plaza
New York, NY 10004

michael.keats@friedfrank.com
(212) 859-8914
Party name: Financial Economists
Wendy Liu
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

wliu@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen and Public Citizen Foundation
Jeremy Charles Marwell
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

jmarwell@velaw.com
202-639-6507
Party name: The Society for Corporate Governance
Laura Helen Posner
    Counsel of Record
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
88 Pine Street, 14th Floor
New York, NY 10005

lposner@cohenmilstein.com
212-220-2925
Party name: The North American Securities Administrators Association, Inc.
Lyle Roberts
    Counsel of Record
Shearman & Sterling LLP
401 9th Street, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20004

lyle.roberts@shearman.com
202 508-8108
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
John Paul Schnapper-Casteras
    Counsel of Record
Schnapper-Casteras PLLC
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

jpsc@schnappercasteras.com
(202) 630-3644
Party name: Better Markets, Inc.
Carolyn E. Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Schnapper-Casteras PLLC
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

cshapiro@schnappercasteras.com
(202) 630-3644
Party name: Former SEC Officials
Gregory Silbert
    Counsel of Record
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
767 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10153

gregory.silbert@weil.com
(212) 310 8846
Party name: American International Group, Inc. And Chubb Group Holdings Inc.
Nicholas Mark Sydow
    Counsel of Record
Office of the New Mexico Attorney General
201 Third St., Suite 300
Albuquerque, NM 87102

nsydow@nmag.gov
505-717-3571
Party name: State of New Mexico, et al.
Ernest A. Young
    Counsel of Record
3208 Fox Terrace Drive
Apex, NC 27502

young@law.duke.edu
(919) 360-7718
Party name: National Association of Shareholder and Consumer Attorneys
Jonathan K. Youngwood
    Counsel of Record
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

JYoungwood@STBLAW.com
2124553539
Party name: Securities and Financial Markets Association, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543