Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-20
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-20
Title:Benito Casanova, Petitioner
v.
International Association of Machinists, Local 701
Docketed:July 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2987)
   Decision Date:February 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2020Waiver of right of respondent International Association of Machinists, Local 701 to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 04 2020Response Requested. (Due September 3, 2020)
Sep 03 2020Brief of respondent International Association of Machinists, Local 701 in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2020Reply of petitioner Benito Casanova filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 05 2020Rescheduled.
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 14 2020Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Aaron Becket Solem
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
8001 Braddock Rd
Springfield, VA 22160

abs@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: Benito Casanova
Attorneys for Respondent
Ramya Ravindran
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
805 15th Street, N.W. Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

rravindran@bredhoff.com
2028422600
Party name: International Association of Machinists, Local 701

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543