Docket for 20-1669 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
May 27 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2021) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 17 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2021 to August 2, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 22 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 2, 2021. | | | Aug 02 2021 | Brief of respondent Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 17 2021 | Reply of Will not accepted for filing. (August 27, 2021 - Corrected brief to be submitted) | | | Aug 17 2021 | Reply of petitioner Robert G. Will filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 18 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021. | | | Sep 02 2021 | Record Requested. | | | Sep 02 2021 | Record received from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit. The record is available on PACER. | | | Sep 24 2021 | Record received from the U.S.D.C. for the Southern District of Texas. One CD containing Electronic Record on Appeal received. | | | Sep 29 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021. | | | Oct 18 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|